VA HB1289 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on October 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Same-sex marriages; civil unions. Repeals the statutory prohibitions on same-sex marriages and civil unions or other arrangements between persons of the same sex purporting to bestow the privileges and obligations of marriage. The bill does not affect the prohibition on these relationships contained in Article I, Section 15-A of the Constitution of Virginia.
Title
Same-sex marriages; civil unions.
Sponsors
Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Sen. Scott Surovell [D] |
Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Rob Krupicka [D] | Del. Daun Hester [D] |
Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2015-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 4-N) |
2015-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2014-10-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-10-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100152D |