VA HB1314 | 2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1314
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-02 - Continued to 2025 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-02 - Continued to 2025 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; political campaign advertisements; advertisements sponsored by a person or political committee that is not a party committee. Elections; political campaign advertisements; advertisements sponsored by a person or political committee that is not a party committee.
Title
Political campaign advertisements; advertisements sponsored by a person or nonparty committee.
Sponsors
Del. Joshua Cole [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-02 | House | Continued to 2025 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2025 by voice vote |
2024-01-28 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2024-01-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24105189D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1314 (Carry Over) 2024-02-02 - Continued to 2025 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote