VA HB1323 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - Incorporated by Education
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - Incorporated by Education
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Instructional positions; students identified as having limited English proficiency. Requires state funding to be provided pursuant to the general appropriation act to support 20 full-time equivalent instructional positions for each 1,000 students identified as having limited English proficiency. Current law requires state funding to support 17 such positions for each 1,000 such students.
Title
Instructional positions; students identified as having limited English proficiency.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | House | Incorporated by Education |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB975-Guzman) by voice vote |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: SOL and SOQ |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103311D |
Same As/Similar To
HB975 (Similar To) 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1034)
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1323 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1323+hil |