VA HB134 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0051)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0051)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Education; individualized education program teams; guidelines. Requires the Department of Education to establish guidelines for individualized education program (IEP) teams to utilize when developing IEPs for children with disabilities to ensure that IEP teams consider the need for age-appropriate and developmentally appropriate instruction related to sexual health, self-restraint, self-protection, respect for personal privacy, and personal boundaries of others. The bill requires each local school board, in developing IEPs for children with disabilities, in addition to any other requirements established by the Board of Education, to ensure that IEP teams consider such guidelines.
Title
Individualized education program teams; Department of Education to develop guidelines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0051) | |
2020-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 51 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 2, 2020 | |
2020-02-24 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 24, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB134ER) |
2020-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Passage (96-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-04 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-03 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-31 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-30 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-27 | House | Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12 |
2019-12-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-12-17 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103163D |
Same As/Similar To
SB186 (Same As) 2020-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0170)