VA HB1351 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0564)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0564)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Diploma seals; biliteracy. Requires the Board of Education to establish, in time to apply to high school seniors graduating in 2016, criteria for awarding a diploma seal of biliteracy to any student who demonstrates proficiency in English and at least one other language. The bill requires the Board to consider criteria including the student's (i) score on a College Board Advanced Placement foreign language examination, (ii) score on an SAT II Subject Test in a foreign language, (iii) proficiency level on an ACTFL Assessment of Performance toward Proficiency in Languages (AAPPL) measure or another nationally or internationally recognized language proficiency test, or (iv) cumulative grade point average in a sequence of foreign language courses approved by the Board.
Title
Diploma seals; biliteracy.
Sponsors
Del. Jeion Ward [D] | Del. James LeMunyon [R] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. David Ramadan [R] |
Del. Daun Hester [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 1-N) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 92-N) (Y: 0 N: 94 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (33-Y 4-N) (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (31-Y 4-N) (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 1-N) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 92-N) (Y: 0 N: 94 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (33-Y 4-N) (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (31-Y 4-N) (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0564) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 564 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1351ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-26 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2015-02-25 | House | Conference substitute printed 15105501D-H1 |
2015-02-25 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senators: McWaters, Wexton, Smith |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2015-02-23 | House | Delegates: Ramadan, Landes, Bulova |
2015-02-23 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2015-02-23 | House | House acceded to request |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 92-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 15105067D-S1 (0-Y 92-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (33-Y 4-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (31-Y 4-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1351S1 |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15105067D-S1 |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15105067D-S1 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 3-N) |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-02 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-16 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2014-12-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-12-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100367D |
Same As/Similar To
SB916 (Same As) 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0565)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 253.13:4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 254.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |