VA HB1362 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0221)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0221)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School bus video-monitoring system; citations. Prohibits a contract between a private vendor and a school division for the operation of school bus video-monitoring systems to capture passing stopped school bus violations from requiring a minimum quota of violations captured or citations issued for the video-monitoring system to be deployed. School bus video-monitoring system; citations. Prohibits a contract between a private vendor and a school division for the operation of school bus video-monitoring systems to capture passing stopped school bus violations from requiring a minimum quota of violations captured or citations issued for the video-monitoring system to be deployed.
Title
School bus video-monitoring system; citations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0221) | |
2024-03-28 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 221 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1362ER) |
2024-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-12 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | House | Printed as engrossed 24104633D-E |
2024-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1362E |
2024-02-09 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2024-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-06 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Innovations (Ad Hoc) |
2024-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24104633D |