VA HB1372 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Autonomous vehicles and piloted vehicles; definition. Defines "autonomous vehicles" and "piloted vehicles" for purposes of Title 46.2 (Motor Vehicles).
Title
Autonomous vehicles and piloted vehicles; definitions.
Sponsors
Del. Glenn Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Transportation |
2016-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2016-01-29 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2016-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-01-22 | House | Presented and ordered printed 16103854D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB1372 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB1372+hil |