VA HB1385 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1385
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-07 - Continued to 2025 in Education by voice vote
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-07 - Continued to 2025 in Education by voice vote
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
School boards; placement in alternative education programs; disclosure of certain information in delinquency cases. Requires the clerk of any court in which a disposition is entered or deferred in any proceeding where a student is charged with an offense that, pursuant to relevant law, is required to be disclosed to the superintendent of the school division in which the student is enrolled to, upon request of any such division superintendent, provide additional information that may be relevant to such student's placement in an alternative education program, including the circumstances surrounding the disposition or deferred disposition and any conditions ordered in relation to a deferred disposition. If the student is not enrolled in school at the time the disposition is entered or deferred, the clerk is required to send the additional information to the division superintendent of the school in which he was enrolled at the time of the offense, upon request of such division superintendent.
Title
School boards; placement in alternative education programs, disclosure of certain information.
Sponsors
Del. Paul Milde [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | House | Continued to 2025 in Education by voice vote |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2025 by voice vote |
2024-02-01 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24104028D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1385 (Carry Over) 2024-02-07 - Continued to 2025 in Education by voice vote
SB444 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Left in Education
SB444 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Left in Education
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 305.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 277.2:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |