VA HB1388 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0688)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0688)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public school accreditation; triennial review. Eliminates the ability of a school that only maintains a passing rate on Virginia assessment program tests or additional tests approved by the Board of Education of 95 percent or above in each of the four core academic areas for two consecutive years to apply for and receive a waiver of accreditation from the Department of Education, which waiver confers full accreditation for a three-year period. Current law provides high-performing schools a separate pathway to obtain three-year accreditation.
Title
Public school accreditation; triennial review.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0688) | |
2020-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 688 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1388ER) |
2020-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: SOL and SOQ |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102722D |