VA HB1436 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-09 - Left in Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-09 - Left in Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Sales tax revenues; entertainment arena. Adds entertainment arena to the definition of public facility to allow a locality to collect all sales tax revenues generated by transactions at such a facility, provided that a locality owns an interest in the facility and contributes to financing its construction. The bill also allows a municipality to issue bonds to finance a public facility on or after July 1, 2024, but prior to July 1, 2027, and adds Henrico County to the list of eligible localities. Sales tax revenues; entertainment arena. Adds entertainment arena to the definition of public facility to allow a locality to collect all sales tax revenues generated by transactions at such a facility, provided that a locality owns an interest in the facility and contributes to financing its construction. The bill also allows a municipality to issue bonds to finance a public facility on or after July 1, 2024, but prior to July 1, 2027, and adds Henrico County to the list of eligible localities.
Title
Sales tax revenues; entertainment arena.
Sponsors
Del. Bonita Anthony [D] | Del. Alex Askew [D] | Del. Destiny LeVere Bolling [D] | Del. Delores McQuinn [D] |
Del. Rodney Willett [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (66-Y 33-N) (Y: 66 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-09 | Senate | Left in Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Passage (66-Y 33-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (66-Y 33-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Printed as engrossed 24103378D-E |
2024-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1436E |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (13-Y 8-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-02-02 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2024-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2024-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24103378D |