VA HB146 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-05 - Incorporated by Education
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-05 - Incorporated by Education
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Early childhood care and education; publicly funded providers; exemption from licensure for certain child day programs. Excepts military child care fee assistance or any child care subsidy paid by a branch of the Armed Forces of the United States from the federal funds that would otherwise render a child day program as a "publicly funded provider," as that term is defined and used in relevant law relating to early childhood care and education. The bill also exempts from licensure by the Superintendent of Public Instruction any child day program that (i) serves only dependent children of military personnel and (ii) (a) is located on a military base or federal property or (b) is certified as a family child care provider by a branch of the Armed Forces of the United States and provides that any branch of the Armed Forces of the United States or its agent, including an installation commander of a military base on which a child day program is located, may assume responsibility for approving or determining which children may be served by the program that is so exempted from licensure.
Title
Early childhood care and education; publicly funded providers, exemption from licensure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | House | Incorporated by Education |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB739-Sewell) by voice vote |
2024-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Early Childhood |
2024-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101460D |
Same As/Similar To
HB739 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0049)
SB75 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Incorporated by Education and Health
SB702 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0259)
SB75 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Incorporated by Education and Health
SB702 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0259)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 289.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 289.030 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |