VA HB1472 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0150)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0150)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State and Local Government Conflict of Interests Act; prohibited contracts; exceptions for certain contracts entered into by an officer or employee of a soil and water conservation district. Provides an exception to the prohibition against contracts between employing agencies and their officers or employees for contracts by an officer or employee of a soil and water conservation district or an immediate family member of such officer or employee to participate in a cost-share program for the installation of best management practices to improve water quality. The exception does not apply to subcontracts or other agreements entered into to provide services for implementation of a cost-share contract established under such program. The bill provides that the exception applies to all contracts entered into on and after July 1, 2017, and to any contract entered into by an officer or employee or an immediate family member of such officer or employee with a soil and water conservation district to participate in a cost-share program for the installation of best management practices to improve water quality prior to July 1, 2017. This bill is identical to SB 965.
Title
Conflict of Interests Act, State and Local Government; prohibited contracts, exceptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0150) | |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 150 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017 | |
2017-02-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/17/17 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-16 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1472ER) |
2017-02-16 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-20 | House | Printed as engrossed 17100715D-E |
2017-01-20 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1472E |
2017-01-20 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-01-20 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-19 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-17 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-11 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2016-12-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2016-12-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100715D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Conflict of Interests
Contracts
Counties Cities and Towns
Drainage Soil Conservation Sanitation and Public Facilities Districts
Local Government and Officials
Conflict of Interests
Contracts
Counties Cities and Towns
Drainage Soil Conservation Sanitation and Public Facilities Districts
Local Government and Officials