VA HB1484 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Safety Communications Infrastructure Fund and Program; established. Establishes the Virginia Public Safety Communications Infrastructure Fund and Program, to be administered by the Department of Emergency Management and financially managed by the Virginia Resources Authority, for the purpose of making loans and awarding grants to local governments to assist with improvement projects relating to public safety radio and communications infrastructure. Virginia Public Safety Communications Infrastructure Fund and Program; established. Establishes the Virginia Public Safety Communications Infrastructure Fund and Program, to be administered by the Department of Emergency Management and financially managed by the Virginia Resources Authority, for the purpose of making loans and awarding grants to local governments to assist with improvement projects relating to public safety radio and communications infrastructure.
Title
Virginia Public Safety Communications Infrastructure Fund and Program; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2024-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24104802D |