VA HB1499 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-9)
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0045)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-9)
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0045)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Right to breastfeed in public places. Provides that a mother may breastfeed in any place where the mother is lawfully present. Current law allows breastfeeding on any property owned, leased, or controlled by the Commonwealth.
Title
Breastfeeding in public places; mother's right.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0045) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 45 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/25/15 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1499ER) |
2015-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Courts of Justice |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Rereferred from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-06 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-03 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2015-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101318D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1427 (Same As) 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0105)