VA HB1523 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0191)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0191)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Board of Workforce Development; qualification for services related to the Workforce Investment Act. Provides that for the purposes of implementing the Workforce Investment Act (WIA), income from service in the Virginia National Guard shall not disqualify unemployed service members from WIA-related services.
Title
Workforce Development, Virginia Board of; qualification for services related to WIA.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Byron [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0191) | |
2015-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 191 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1523ER) |
2015-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-01-28 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-22 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-15 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2015-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101848D |