VA HB1546 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - Incorporated by Labor and Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - Incorporated by Labor and Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Health benefit plans; bills for emergency services; surprise bills; dispute resolution. Requires the Commissioner of the Bureau of Insurance to certify independent dispute resolution entities to resolve disputes arising from surprise bills for non-emergency health care services and for emergency service provided by non-participating providers. The measure implements "baseball-style" arbitration to resolve disputes between health carriers and physicians. Under this approach, each party submits a proposed dollar amount to the independent dispute resolution entity, who then chooses one as the appropriate payment amount. The measure provides that when an insured assigns benefits for a surprise bill or a bill for emergency services in writing to a non-participating physician who knows the insured is covered under a health benefit plan, the non-participating physician shall not bill the insured except for any applicable coinsurance, copayment, or deductible that would be owed if the insured utilized a participating physician.
Title
Health benefit plans; bills for emergency services, surprise bills, dispute resolution.
Sponsors
Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Del. Clinton Jenkins [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Del. Lee Ware [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Incorporated by Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2020-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20104464D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1251 (Similar To) 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1080)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 3445 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3465 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3472 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1546 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1546+hil |