VA HB157 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0645)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0645)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter schools; restrictions and pre-lottery enrollment for current students of conversion charter schools. Provides that in the case of the conversion of an existing public school, students who attend the school and the siblings of such students may be given the opportunity to enroll in advance of the lottery process. The bill provides that the current requirement that at least one-half of public charter schools per division be for at-risk students does not apply to converted public schools.
Title
Charter schools; restrictions and pre-lottery enrollment for current students.
Sponsors
Del. Richard Bell [R] | Del. Thomas Greason [R] | Del. Randall Minchew [R] | Del. Mark Berg [R] |
Del. Dave LaRock [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (76-Y 19-N) (Y: 78 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (36-Y 1-N) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (6-Y 91-N) (Y: 6 N: 93 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 98 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (76-Y 19-N) (Y: 78 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (36-Y 1-N) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (6-Y 91-N) (Y: 6 N: 93 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 98 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0645) | |
2014-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 645 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-17 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB157ER) |
2014-03-17 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-06 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (76-Y 19-N) |
2014-03-06 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (76-Y 19-N) |
2014-03-06 | House | Conference substitute printed 14105553D-H1 |
2014-03-06 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2014-02-18 | House | Delegates: Minchew, Greason, Howell, A.T. |
2014-02-18 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senators: Miller, Favola, Newman |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2014-02-17 | House | House acceded to request |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (36-Y 1-N) |
2014-02-12 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (6-Y 91-N) |
2014-02-12 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 14104919D-S1 (6-Y 91-N) |
2014-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB157S1 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14104919D-S1 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14104919D-S1 |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-30 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N) |
2014-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 3-N) |
2014-01-29 | House | Printed as engrossed 14102972D-E |
2014-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB157E |
2014-01-29 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-27 | House | Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Reform |
2013-12-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-12-20 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102972D |
Same As/Similar To
SB276 (Same As) 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0693)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 212.11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 212.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 212.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |