VA HB1767 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0547)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0547)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Unlawful detainer proceedings; satisfaction of judgments. Provides that in an unlawful detainer proceeding in which the defendant fails to appear, the plaintiff may submit evidence of outstanding rent and other damages by affidavit or sworn testimony. The bill also provides that if a lease requires rent to be due on the first of the month in advance for the entire month, the amount due at the date of the hearing shall include rent for the entire month, if so requested by the plaintiff. The bill further requires a creditor to note satisfaction of a judgment only when it has been fully paid.
Title
Unlawful detainer proceedings; satisfaction of judgments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0547) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 547 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/27/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1767ER) |
2015-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 15105146D-S1 (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1767S1 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15105146D-S1 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15105146D-S1 |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1767H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104164D-H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104164D-H1 |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2015-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101162D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 01 | 126 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 128 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 129 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 454 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |