VA HB201 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax exemption; elderly and disabled. Removes the requirement that "income" be restricted to that which is taxable under federal income tax laws, for purposes of a locality that elects to have income caps in determining eligibility of the elderly and disabled for tax relief.
Title
Real estate tax; exemption for elderly and disabled.
Sponsors
Del. Jeion Ward [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | House: Left in Finance | |
2012-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-01-12 | House: Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 | |
2012-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102563D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB201 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB201+hil |