VA HB212 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (10-Y 10-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (10-Y 10-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Custody and visitation arrangements; foster care; adoption; use of cannabidiol oil or THC-A oil. Provides that the use of cannabidiol oil or THC-A oil by a parent in a custody or visitation case shall not serve as the sole basis for the denial or restriction of custody or visitation, if such parent has a written certification by a practitioner attesting to the benefit of such use. The bill further provides that such use by a foster parent shall not be the sole reason a child is removed from a foster parent and that such use by a prospective foster parent shall not be the sole reason to deny such prospective foster parent eligibility to become a foster parent. The bill also provides that such use by a petitioner for adoption shall not be the sole reason for the denial of a final order of adoption by a circuit court.
Title
Custody and visitation arrangements; use of cannabidiol oil or THC-A oil by foster parent, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (10-Y 10-N) (Y: 10 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | House | Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (10-Y 10-N) |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred from Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2019-12-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-12-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102994D |