VA HB215 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB215
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Voter registration; preregistration for persons age 16 or older. Permits a person who is otherwise qualified to register to vote and is 16 years of age or older, but who will not be 18 years of age on or before the day of the next general election, to preregister to vote. The preregistration does not entitle such a person to vote in any election except as already permitted by law. The bill requires the Department of Elections to maintain a record of all preregistered voters in the Virginia voter registration system, which shall automatically register a person who is preregistered upon that person reaching 18 years or age or becoming eligible for advance registration as already permitted by law, whichever comes first. The bill requires the Department to provide to the general registrars voter confirmation documents for such voters.
Title
Voter registration; preregistration for persons age 16 or older.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2020-01-31 | House | Continued to 2021 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2019-12-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-12-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101633D |
Same As/Similar To
HB215 (Carry Over) 2020-01-31 - Continued to 2021 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote