VA HB216 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Conservation and Recreation; variances to general permit requirements for certain impounding structures; hazard potential classifications study; report. Requires the Soil and Water Conservation Board to develop a process by which an owner may submit a request only to the Department of Conservation and Recreation for a temporary or permanent variance to the general permit requirements for certain impounding structures for its review and consideration. The bill directs the Department to study issues relating to hazard potential classifications for impounding structures in the Commonwealth and report its findings to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources and the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources by December 1, 2024. The bill also directs the Department to advise the Governor and the Secretary of Natural and Historic Resources of any variances to the general permit requirements granted by the Department. Department of Conservation and Recreation; variances to general permit requirements for certain impounding structures; hazard potential classifications study; report. Requires the Soil and Water Conservation Board to develop a process by which an owner may submit a request only to the Department of Conservation and Recreation for a temporary or permanent variance to the general permit requirements for certain impounding structures for its review and consideration. The bill directs the Department to study issues relating to hazard potential classifications for impounding structures in the Commonwealth and report its findings to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources and the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources by December 1, 2024. The bill also directs the Department to advise the Governor and the Secretary of Natural and Historic Resources of any variances to the general permit requirements granted by the Department.
Title
Impounding structures, certain; variances to general permit requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2024-01-26 | House | Rereferred to Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2024-01-26 | House | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2024-01-24 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (15-Y 7-N) |
2024-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 2-N) |
2024-01-15 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2024-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2024-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100333D |