VA HB238 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0253)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0253)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State Corporation Commission; electronic registration system. Extends the date, from July 1, 2018, to January 1, 2020, after which the State Corporation Commission is required to limit the users who will be able to submit data and documents on behalf of a business entity. The users who will be eligible to use the system after that date are those (i) who have been designated to make the submission on behalf of the business entity and (ii) whose identity has been established satisfactorily through a verification process. The measure also deletes a reference to the Commission's registration system as "eFile."
Title
State Corporation Commission; electronic registration system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0253) | |
2018-03-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 253 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB238ER) |
2018-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-01-22 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-22 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-18 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-16 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101900D |