VA HB239 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Advisory Council on Sickle Cell Disease; established; report. Establishes the Advisory Council on Sickle Cell Disease to advise the State Health Commissioner on the efforts to improve awareness of sickle cell disease and the needs of individuals with sickle cell disease. The bill requires the Board of Health to report annually by December 1 to the Governor and the General Assembly regarding its activities and recommendations.
Title
Sickle Cell Disease, Advisory Council on; established, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Rules |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-25 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies Subcommittee |
2024-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101287D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 73.21 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 73.22 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |