VA HB257 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-20 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-20 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Local defined contribution retirement plan. Permits any locality or school board to establish a defined contribution retirement plan, in lieu of any other retirement plan, for employees hired after such plan is established.
Title
Defined contribution retirement plan; permits any locality or school board to establish.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-20 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2012-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-01-16 | House: Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100515D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB257 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB257+hil |