VA HB291 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Driving while intoxicated; restricted license. Provides that an adult convicted of a first offense of § 18.2-266 (driving while intoxicated) or 18.2-266.1 (person under 21 driving after consuming alcohol) may be issued a restricted license that permits operation of a motor vehicle for a period of 14 consecutive hours per day on no more than six days per week. The bill does not affect the requirement for the installation of an ignition interlock.
Title
Driving under influence of alcohol; restricted license.
Sponsors
Del. David Albo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2014-01-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2013-12-31 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-12-31 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101862D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 270.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 271.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB291 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB291+hil |