VA HB295 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Protective order in case of family abuse; parents; minors. Prohibits the parent of a minor from filing a petition for a family abuse protective order against such minor, or from filing as next friend on behalf of his minor child against another of his minor children, provided that the minor has not otherwise been emancipated pursuant to law.
Title
Protective orders; prohibits parent of a minor from filing a petition for family abuse, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2024-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104394D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 253.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 253.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 279.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |