VA HB303 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Certification of ancillary traffic infractions and civil offenses. Allows the court to certify any ancillary traffic infraction or civil offense to the clerk of the circuit court upon certification of any felony offense, provided that the attorney for the Commonwealth and the accused consent to such certification. Current law only allows ancillary misdemeanor offenses to be certified.
Title
Ancillary traffic infractions and civil offenses; certification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2024-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103361D |