VA HB327 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Law-Enforcement Officers Procedural Guarantee Act; definition of law-enforcement officer. Adds certain employees of the Department of Corrections to the definition of "law-enforcement officer" for purposes of the Law-Enforcement Officers Procedural Guarantee Act. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Law-Enforcement Officers Procedural Guarantee Act; definition of law-enforcement officer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2014-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-14 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2014-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2014-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100226D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB327 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB327+hil |