VA HB335 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0278)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0278)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Official emblems and designations; Eastern Garter Snake. Establishes the Eastern Garter Snake (Thamnophis sirtalis sirtalis) as the official snake of the Commonwealth. The bill also adds to § 1-510 of the Code of Virginia, which consolidates official state emblems and designations, two designations
Title
Official emblems and designations; addition of Eastern Garter Snake.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0278) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 278 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 11, 2016 | |
2016-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/4/16 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-29 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB335ER) |
2016-02-29 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (33-Y 6-N 1-A) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Black rejected |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-01 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-29 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-26 | House | Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) |
2016-01-18 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2016-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2016-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101043D |