VA HB338 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Use of resources to enforce the Affordable Care Act. Prohibits the Commonwealth and its political subdivisions from using any personnel or financial resources to enforce, administer, or cooperate with the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act. The funding or administration of certain regulatory activities, including those related to the Medicaid and CHIP programs, are exempt from the prohibition.
Title
Affordable Care Act; use of resources to enforce.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2016-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2016-01-14 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2016-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101110D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB338 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB338+hil |