VA HB372 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting loitering; curfew for minors; age restrictions on trick-or-treating. Prohibits localities from imposing age restrictions on trick-or-treating that exceed current loitering and curfew provisions.
Title
Loitering; curfew for minors, age restrictions on trick-or-treating.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2022-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 4-N) |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102248D |