VA HB378 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-13 - VOTE: Defeated (47-Y 52-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-13 - VOTE: Defeated (47-Y 52-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Release of developer performance guarantees. Clarifies that existing provisions related to the periodic partial and final release of developer performance guarantees also applies to performance guarantees for erosion and sediment control measures, stormwater management facilities, and fill and borrow areas.
Title
Developer performance guarantees; clarifies existing provisions related to periodic partial release.
Sponsors
Del. David Owen [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Defeated (47-Y 52-N) (Y: 47 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Defeated (47-Y 52-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and defeated by House (47-Y 52-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-09 | House | Passed by for the day |
2024-02-08 | House | Passed by for the day |
2024-02-07 | House | Passed by for the day |
2024-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-02 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (17-Y 5-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2024-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103315D |