VA HB398 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Radiology benefits managers. Requires that any decision by a radiology benefits manager to deny a treating physician's order or recommendation for a diagnostic radiology test be made by a physician. An authorization to perform a diagnostic radiology test given by a health carrier or by a radiology benefits manager shall be conclusive to satisfy any requirement of medical necessity in a health benefit plan or a health carrier's plan, policy, or schedule of benefits. A managed care health insurance utilization review entity's utilization review plan is required to include a provision designed to ensure that adverse determinations by a radiology benefits manager are made by a licensed physician. Any person who countermands the treatment order or recommendation of a treating physician for a diagnostic radiology test by any means or manner that is intended to influence the patient to refuse a recommended diagnostic radiology test or to elect to receive a different service than the diagnostic radiology test ordered or recommended by the treating physician shall be deemed to be practicing medicine.
Title
Radiology benefits managers; decision to deny physician's order for diagnostic radiology test.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2012-01-31 | House | Continued to 2013 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2012-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2013 by voice vote |
2012-01-16 | House | Assigned HWI sub: #3 |
2012-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2012-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100674D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 137.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB398 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB398+hil |