VA HB41 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB41
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Continued to 2025 in Education by voice vote
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Continued to 2025 in Education by voice vote
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Standards of Learning; programs of instruction; civics education; instruction on local government. Requires the Board of Education to include in the Standards of Learning for Virginia and United States Government for grade 12 and requires each school board to provide as a part of any Virginia and U.S. Government course or civic education course offered to students in grade 12 instruction on local government, including instruction on the types of localities in the Commonwealth and the structure and functions of local governments in the Commonwealth. The bill also requires the Board to consider in its criteria for awarding a diploma seal for excellence in civics education and understanding of the state and federal constitutions and the democratic model of government the successful completion of government or civics courses that include instruction on the structures and functions of local government.
Title
Standards of Learning; programs of instruction, civics education on local government.
Sponsors
Del. Chad Green [R] | Del. Mike Cherry [R] | Del. Mark Earley [R] | Del. Baxter Ennis [R] |
Del. Hyland Fowler [R] | Del. Chris Runion [R] | Del. Kim Taylor [R] | Del. Wendell Walker [R] |
Del. Eric Zehr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | House | Continued to 2025 in Education by voice vote |
2024-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2025 by voice vote |
2024-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 Subcommittee |
2023-12-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-12-20 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101089D |
Same As/Similar To
HB41 (Carry Over) 2024-01-24 - Continued to 2025 in Education by voice vote
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 253.13:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 253.13:4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |