VA HB415 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0219)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0219)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Board for People with Disabilities; powers and duties. Requires the Board for People with Disabilities to submit an annual report, beginning July 1, 2017, to the Governor that provides an in-depth assessment of at least two major service areas for people with disabilities. Under current law, the Board assesses the entire system on a triennial basis. The bill provides that the Board once every four years shall make available to the public all the service areas it intends to review over the following four years and shall ensure that such areas are reviewed at least once in the four-year period.
Title
People with Disabilities, Virginia Board for; powers and duties, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0219) | |
2016-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 219 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-29 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 7, 2016 | |
2016-02-29 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/29/16 |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB415ER) |
2016-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-24 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-01-25 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House (91-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-21 | House | Printed as engrossed 16101380D-E |
2016-01-21 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB415E |
2016-01-21 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-01-21 | House | Read second time |
2016-01-20 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-19 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (21-Y 1-N) |
2016-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2016-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101380D |