VA HB416 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; audits. Prohibits an insurer or its agent or employee from conducting an audit, inspection, or other review at the insured employer's premises unless accompanied by and under the supervision of an employee of the Workers' Compensation Commission, or unless the employer consents.
Title
Workers' compensation; audits of employer's premises.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-18 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103729D |