VA HB419 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-4-1)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0084)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-4-1)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0084)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Veterans Services; processing of disability claims. Requires the Department of Veterans Services to replace its existing case management technology, which replacement is required to support highly sophisticated electronic claims preparation.
Title
Veterans Services, Department of; processing of disability claims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0084) | |
2010-03-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 84 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-02-24 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-02-24 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB419ER) | |
2010-02-24 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-19 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-10 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-10 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-09 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-03 | House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-02 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-02-02 | House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-15 | House: Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103783D |