VA HB419 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Estate tax reinstated. Reinstates the estate tax for persons dying on or after July 1, 2012. No estate tax will be imposed on a gross estate if the majority of the assets of the estate is an interest in a closely held business or a working farm. The revenues from the estate tax would first be used for funding staffing standards in nursing homes required to be established under the bill, which staffing standards would require a minimum period of time of direct care services to each resident per 24-hour period.
Title
Estate tax; reinstated for persons dying on or after July 1, 2012.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | House: Left in Finance | |
2012-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-01-20 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #2 | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101398D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 127 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 912 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB419 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB419+hil |