VA HB424 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Free use of toll facilities; certain disabled veterans. Authorizes the free use of all toll bridges, toll roads, and other toll facilities in the Commonwealth for drivers who have been rated by the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs as having a 100 percent service-connected, permanent, and total disability. The bill also replaces the current window sticker for certain persons exempted from tolls due to a disability with a specialized electronic toll collection device identifying such person as eligible for free passage.
Title
Toll facilities; free use by certain disabled veterans.
Sponsors
Del. Chad Green [R] | Del. Nadarius Clark [D] | Del. Baxter Ennis [R] | Del. Ian Lovejoy [R] |
Del. Chris Runion [R] | Del. Wendell Walker [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Transportation |
2024-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 1-N) |
2024-01-18 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Infrastructure and Funding |
2024-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101086D |