VA HB430 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0500)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0500)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Incentives for inter-local service delivery. Expands the scope of the Regional Cooperation Incentive Fund to foster inter-local service delivery consolidation or coordination where such consolidation or coordination will result in the more efficient use of local funds.
Title
Inter-local service delivery; expands scope of Regional Cooperation Incentive Fund to foster.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 3-N) (Y: 99 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 3-N) (Y: 99 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0500) | |
2012-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 500 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-07 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-07 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB430ER) | |
2012-03-07 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 1-N 1-A) | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-14 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 3-N) | |
2012-02-14 | House: Read third time and passed House (97-Y 3-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-10 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) | |
2012-01-13 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2 | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102175D |