VA HB430 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; absentee voting; no-excuse, in-person. Allows qualified voters to vote absentee in person without providing an excuse for not being able to vote in person on election day. The bill retains the statutory list of specific reasons allowing a voter to cast an absentee ballot by mail.
Title
Elections; absentee voting; no-excuse, in-person.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2016-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-14 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2016-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2016-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102772D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB430 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB430+hil |