VA HB434 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0553)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0553)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Freedom of Information Act; exemption for credit card and bank account data. Exempts from the mandatory disclosure provisions of the Freedom of Information Act those portions of records that contain account numbers or routing information for any credit card, debit card, or other account with a financial institution of any person or public body. The bill provides, however, that access shall not be denied to the person who is the subject of the record. The bill defines "financial institution" and contains an emergency clause. The bill is a recommendation of the Freedom of Information Advisory Council.
Title
Freedom of Information Act; exemption for credit card and bank account data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0553) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 553 (effective 4/11/10) | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-09 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-09 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB434ER) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-24 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-04 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-03 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-02 | House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-15 | House: Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/10 10100476D |