VA HB434 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
State parks; lifetime senior parking pass. Directs the Department of Conservation and Recreation to establish a lifetime senior parking pass card that authorizes any person who has paid a one-time fee and has reached the age of 60 to park at any of Virginia's state parks without being required to pay a parking fee at any such park.
Title
State parks; lifetime senior parking pass.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (5-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2020-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101081D |