VA HB434 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0645)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0645)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal sexual assault; definition of intimate parts; penalty. Includes in the definition of "intimate parts," for the purposes of criminal sexual assault, the chest of a child under the age of 15. Criminal sexual assault; definition of intimate parts; penalty. Includes in the definition of "intimate parts," for the purposes of criminal sexual assault, the chest of a child under the age of 15.
Title
Criminal sexual assault; broadens definition of intimate parts, penalty.
Sponsors
Del. Briana Sewell [D] | Del. Ronnie Campbell [R] | Del. Charniele Herring [D] | Del. Michelle Maldonado [D] |
Del. Candi Mundon King [D] | Del. Eileen Filler-Corn [D] | Del. Jackie Glass [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0645) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 645 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB434ER) |
2022-03-21 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-11 | House | VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-11 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-11 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senators: Surovell, Boysko, Stuart |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-10 | House | Delegates: Sewell, Bell, Campbell, R.R. |
2022-03-10 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-10 | House | House acceded to request |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 96-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 22107162D-S1 (0-Y 96-N) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB434S1 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22107162D-S1 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22107162D-S1 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB434H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22106437D-H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-11 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106437D-H1 |
2022-02-11 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102666D |