VA HB48 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0015)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0015)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education; admissions applications; legacy admissions and admissions based on donor status prohibited. Prohibits any public institution of higher education from providing any manner of preferential treatment in the admissions decision to any student applicant on the basis of such student's legacy status, defined in the bill, or such student's familial relationship to any donor to such institution.
Title
Higher educational institutions, public; admissions applications, legacy admissions, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0015) | |
2024-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 15 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2024 |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB48ER) |
2024-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-01-30 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-29 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-24 | House | Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2023-12-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-12-21 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104163D |
Same As/Similar To
SB46 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0002)
SB71 (Similar To) 2024-01-18 - Incorporated by Education and Health
SB71 (Similar To) 2024-01-18 - Incorporated by Education and Health