VA HB547 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-13 - VOTE: Defeated (47-Y 51-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-13 - VOTE: Defeated (47-Y 51-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Internet Safety Advisory Council; school boards; Internet safety education program. Extends from July 1, 2024, to July 1, 2025, the sunset date for the Internet Safety Advisory Council. The bill requires each school board, after considering the model policy, instructional practices, curricula, and other teacher resources that are developed, recommended, or designed by the Internet Safety Advisory Council, to adopt policies (i) requiring all elementary and secondary schools in the local school division to provide an Internet safety education program to each student in grades three through 12 at least once each school year but (ii) permitting the parent of any such student to opt his child out of participating in such program.
Title
Internet Safety Advisory Council; extends sunset date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Defeated (47-Y 51-N) (Y: 47 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Defeated (47-Y 51-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and defeated by House (47-Y 51-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB547H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Substitute by Delegate Walker out of order 24107469D-H2 |
2024-02-12 | House | VOTE: Adoption (51-Y 48-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to (51-Y 48-N) 24107389D-H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-08 | House | Floor substitute printed 24107469D-H2 (Walker) |
2024-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 24107389D-H1 |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (19-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-01-29 | House | Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Education |
2024-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-19 | House | Assigned CT & I sub: Technology and Innovation |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103048D |