VA HB557 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0070)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0070)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School efficiency reviews; scope and costs. Eliminates the 25 percent match required of local school divisions that request an efficiency review from the Department of Planning and Budget. This provision was in conflict with the current appropriation act, which requires the school division to pay the entire cost of the review. The bill also revises the operational areas examined by the efficiency review and provides that an efficiency review does not constitute an academic review that may be required by the Standards of Quality.
Title
School efficiency reviews; scope and costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0070) | |
2016-03-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 70 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 3, 2016 | |
2016-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/25/16 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB557ER) |
2016-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-04 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N) |
2016-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 2-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-01 | House | Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) |
2016-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100476D |
Same As/Similar To
SB502 (Same As) 2016-02-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0053)