VA HB557 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0479)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0479)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Carnal knowledge of pretrial or posttrial offender; bail bondsmen; penalty. Increases to a Class 6 felony from a Class 1 misdemeanor the penalty for an owner or employee of a bail bond company that posted bond for a person to carnally know such person if the owner or employee has the authority to revoke the person's bond.
Title
Carnal knowledge of pretrial or posttrial offender; bail bondsmen, increases penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0479) | |
2020-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 479 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB557ER) |
2020-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103236D |