VA HB561 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0971)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0971)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Statewide prioritization process; primary evacuation routes. Requires the Office of Intermodal Planning to include in the results of screening candidate projects in the Six-Year Improvement Program whether such projects are located on a primary evacuation route.
Title
Project evaluation; primary evacuation routes.
Sponsors
Sen. Emily Brewer [R] | Del. Jerrauld Jones [D] | Del. Jason Miyares [R] | Del. Alex Askew [D] |
Del. Kelly Convirs-Fowler [D] | Del. James Leftwich [R] | Del. Don Scott [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0971) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 971 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB561ER) |
2020-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-07 | House | VOTE: Passage (99-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (99-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB561H1 |
2020-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107098D-H1 |
2020-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107098D-H1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Systems |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103235D |